There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Veterans Benefits and Transition Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to authorize the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to provide certain burial benefits for spouses and children of veterans who are buried in tribal cemeteries, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
12/31/2018Became Public Law No: 115-407. (TXT | PDF)
12/31/2018Signed by President.
12/27/2018Presented to President.
12/19/2018Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to the House amendment to S. 2248 by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7896)
12/10/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9794-9798)
03/01/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S1321)
03/01/2018Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S1321)
12/19/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
12/31/2018Became Public Law No: 115-407. (TXT | PDF)
12/31/2018Signed by President.
12/27/2018SenatePresented to President.
12/20/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/19/2018SenateSenate agreed to the House amendment to S. 2248 by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7896)
12/11/2018SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
12/10/2018-5:31pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/10/2018-5:31pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9794-9798)
12/10/2018-4:56pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2248.
12/10/2018-4:56pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9794-9802)
12/10/2018-4:56pmHouseMr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
03/05/2018-4:51pmHouseHeld at the desk.
03/05/2018-2:09pmHouseReceived in the House.
03/05/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/01/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S1321)
03/01/2018SenateSenate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1321)
12/19/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 12/19/2017
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 12/19/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Veterans' Affairs12/19/2017 Referred to
03/01/2018 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.2248. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (03/01/2018)

(Sec. 1) This bill directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA), upon request, to provide headstones and markers for: (1) the unmarked graves of veterans' spouses, surviving spouses, and children (including unmarried adult children at the VA's discretion) who are buried in a veterans cemetery owned by a tribal organization or on land owned by or held in trust for a tribal organization; and (2) placement in a veterans cemetery owned by a tribal organization or on tribal land owned by or held in trust by a tribal organization for veterans, spouses, surviving spouses, and eligible dependent children whose remains are unavailable.