There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Global Food Security Reauthorization Act of 2017

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Global Food Security Reauthorization Act of 2017

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Global Food Security Reauthorization Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Global Food Security Reauthorization Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Global Food Security Reauthorization Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to reauthorize the Global Food Security Act of 2016 for 5 additional years.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
10/11/2018Became Public Law No: 115-266.
10/11/2018Signed by President.
10/02/2018Presented to President.
09/28/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
06/19/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
05/22/2018Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker without amendment. Without written report.
12/21/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
10/11/2018Became Public Law No: 115-266.
10/11/2018Signed by President.
10/02/2018SenatePresented to President.
09/28/2018-12:32pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/28/2018-12:32pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H9369)
09/28/2018-12:32pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9369)
09/28/2018-12:31pmHouseMr. Royce (CA) asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
06/20/2018-3:36pmHouseHeld at the desk.
06/20/2018-10:14amHouseReceived in the House.
06/20/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/19/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S4248-4249; text: CR S4249)
05/22/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 427.
05/22/2018SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker without amendment. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Relations
05/22/2018SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Relations
12/21/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations12/21/2017 Referred to
05/22/2018 Markup by
05/22/2018 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.2269. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-266 (10/11/2018)

Global Food Security Reauthorization Act of 2017

This bill amends the Global Food Security Act of 2016 to: (1) extend through FY2023 the program to carry out those portions of the global food security strategy that relate to the Department of State and the U.S. Agency for International Development, and (2) expand requirements for reporting by the President regarding strategy implementation.

The Foreign Assistance Act of 1961 is amended to extend through FY2023 the assistance program for international disaster relief and rehabilitation, including the set-aside for the emergency food security program.