There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to extend the period during which vessels that are shorter than 79 feet in length and fishing vessels are not required to have a permit for discharges incidental to the normal operation of the vessel.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
01/03/2018Became Public Law No: 115-100. (TXT | PDF)
01/03/2018Signed by President.
01/03/2018Presented to President.
12/22/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
12/21/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8278; text: CR S8278)
12/21/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber
01/03/2018Became Public Law No: 115-100. (TXT | PDF)
01/03/2018Signed by President.
01/03/2018SenatePresented to President.
12/22/2017-2:05pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/22/2017-2:05pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection.
12/22/2017-2:05pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent.
12/22/2017-2:05pmHouseMr. Culberson asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
12/22/2017-2:04pmHouseHeld at the desk.
12/22/2017-2:04pmHouseReceived in the House.
12/22/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/21/2017SenateIntroduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8278; text: CR S8278)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 12/21/2017

Committees (0)

As of 04/20/2019 text has not been received for S.2273 - A bill to extend the period during which vessels that are shorter than 79 feet in length and fishing vessels are not required to have a permit for discharges incidental to the normal operation of the vessel.

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.2273. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-100 (01/03/2018)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House passed version is repeated here.)

(Sec. 1) This bill extends through January 19, 2018, the exemption for fishing vessels and other vessels that are shorter than 79 feet in length from National Pollutant Discharge Elimination System permitting requirements for any discharge: (1) of effluent from properly functioning marine engines; (2) of laundry, shower, and galley sink wastes; or (3) that is incidental to the normal operation of the vessel.