Text: S.2273 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-100 (01/03/2018)

 
[115th Congress Public Law 100]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]



[[Page 131 STAT. 2245]]

Public Law 115-100
115th Congress

                                 An Act


 
To extend the period during which vessels that are shorter than 79 feet 
  in length and fishing vessels are not required to have a permit for 
          discharges incidental to the normal operation of the 
              vessel. <<NOTE: Jan. 3, 2018 -  [S. 2273]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,
SECTION 1. EXTENSION OF MORATORIUM.

    Section 2(a) of Public Law 110-299 (33 U.S.C. 1342 note) is amended 
by striking ``December 18, 2017'' and inserting ``January 19, 2018''.

    Approved January 3, 2018.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--S. 2273:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 163 (2017):
            Dec. 21, considered and passed Senate.
            Dec. 22, considered and passed House.

                                  <all>