There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

GAO-IG Act
Good Accounting Obligation in Government Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

GAO-IG Act
Good Accounting Obligation in Government Act

Short Titles as Introduced

GAO-IG Act
Good Accounting Obligation in Government Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require agencies to submit reports on outstanding recommendations in the annual budget justification submitted to Congress.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
01/03/2019Became Public Law No: 115-414.
01/03/2019Signed by President.
12/27/2018Presented to President.
12/21/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 382 - 2 (Roll no. 480).(text: CR H10526)
12/06/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/04/2018Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-331.
01/04/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber
01/03/2019Became Public Law No: 115-414.
01/03/2019Signed by President.
12/27/2018SenatePresented to President.
12/21/2018-10:37amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/21/2018-10:37amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 382 - 2 (Roll no. 480). (text: CR H10526)
12/21/2018-10:33amHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10536)
12/21/2018-9:28amHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/21/2018-9:26amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2276.
12/21/2018-9:26amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10526)
12/21/2018-9:26amHouseMr. Walker moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/10/2018-5:48pmHouseHeld at the desk.
12/10/2018-2:09pmHouseReceived in the House.
12/10/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/06/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/06/2018SenateS.Amdt.4070 Amendment SA 4070 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
12/06/2018SenateS.Amdt.4070 Amendment SA 4070 proposed by Senator Cornyn for Senator Young. (consideration: CR S7370-7371; text: CR S7370-7371) In the nature of a substitute.
12/06/2018SenateThe committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. (CR S7370)
12/06/2018SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7370-7371)
09/04/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 563.
09/04/2018SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-331.
06/13/2018SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
01/04/2018SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Cosponsors (8)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs01/04/2018 Referred to
06/13/2018 Markup by
09/04/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-331

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2276. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/04/2018)

Good Accounting Obligation in Government Act or the GAO-IG Act

This bill requires each federal agency, in its annual budget justification, to include a report on: (1) each public recommendation of the Government Accountability Office (GAO) that is classified as "open" or "closed, unimplemented"; (2) each public recommendation for corrective action from the agency's office of the inspector general (OIG) for which no final action has been taken; and (3) the implementation status of each such recommendation.

Each agency shall also provide a copy of this information to its OIG and to the GAO.