There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

State Offices of Rural Health Reauthorization Act of 2018

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

State Offices of Rural Health Reauthorization Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

State Offices of Rural Health Reauthorization Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

State Offices of Rural Health Reauthorization Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Public Health Service Act to provide grants to improve health care in rural areas.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
12/31/2018Became Public Law No: 115-408.
12/31/2018Signed by President.
12/27/2018Presented to President.
12/19/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 357 - 4 (Roll no. 439).(text: CR H10286-10287)
07/24/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5312-5314; text: CR S5313-5314)
03/12/2018Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment. Without written report.
01/04/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
12/31/2018Became Public Law No: 115-408.
12/31/2018Signed by President.
12/27/2018SenatePresented to President.
12/19/2018-7:19pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/19/2018-7:19pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 357 - 4 (Roll no. 439). (text: CR H10286-10287)
12/19/2018-7:13pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10315-10316)
12/19/2018-4:05pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/19/2018-3:54pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2278.
12/19/2018-3:54pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10286-10288)
12/19/2018-3:54pmHouseMr. Walden moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
07/25/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
07/25/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/25/2018-11:23amHouseReceived in the House.
07/24/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5312-5314; text: CR S5313-5314)
03/12/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 344.
03/12/2018SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions
02/28/2018SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions
01/04/2018SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions01/04/2018 Referred to
02/28/2018 Markup by
03/12/2018 Reported by
House Energy and Commerce07/25/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.2278. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (03/12/2018)

State Offices of Rural Health Reauthorization Act of 2018

This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to reauthorize through FY2022 and revise the grant program for state offices of rural health, including to require the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to make the grants, thus removing HHS's discretion to make them.