There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Small Business 7(a) Lending Oversight Reform Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Small Business 7(a) Lending Oversight Reform Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Small Business Act to strengthen the Office of Credit Risk Management within the Small Business Administration, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
06/05/2018By Senator Risch from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 115-265.
03/19/2018Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
01/09/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
06/05/2018By Senator Risch from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 115-265.
Action By: Senate
05/15/2018Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-322.
03/19/2018Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 351.
Action By: Senate
03/19/2018Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
03/14/2018Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
01/09/2018Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 01/09/2018
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 03/19/2018
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 03/19/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Small Business and Entrepreneurship01/09/2018 Referred to
05/15/2018 Hearings by
03/14/2018 Markup by
03/19/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-265

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.2283. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (03/19/2018)

Small Business 7(a) Lending Oversight Reform Act of 2018

This bill amends the Small Business Act to provide statutory authority for the Small Business Administration (SBA) Office of Credit Risk Management and the SBA Lender Oversight Committee.

For FY2018 and each ensuing fiscal year, the SBA may, with congressional approval, increase the cap for general business loans if the cap will be reached within that fiscal year. An increase may only be implemented once each fiscal year.