There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Nick Castle Peace Corps Reform Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Nick Castle Peace Corps Reform Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Nick Castle Peace Corps Reform Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Peace Corps Act to provide greater protection and services for Peace Corps volunteers, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
03/13/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote.(text as passed: CR S1691-1693)
02/12/2018Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with amendments. Without written report.
01/10/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
03/14/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/14/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/14/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/14/2018-3:38pmHouseReceived in the House.
03/13/2018SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote. (text as passed: CR S1691-1693)
03/13/2018SenateS.Amdt.2209 Amendment SA 2209 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
03/13/2018SenateS.Amdt.2209 Amendment SA 2209 proposed by Senator Rounds for Senator Corker. (consideration: CR S1691; text: CR S1691) To require the Director of the Peace Corps to notify and consult with the Committees on Appropriations before opening, closing, significantly reducing, or suspending a domestic or overseas office or country program.
03/13/2018SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S1688-1693)
02/12/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 308.
02/12/2018SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with amendments. Without written report.
02/07/2018SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
01/10/2018SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Cosponsors (7)


Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations01/10/2018 Referred to
02/07/2018 Markup by
02/12/2018 Reported by
House Foreign Affairs03/14/2018 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce03/14/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2286. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/10/2018)

Nick Castle Peace Corps Reform Act of 2018

This bill provides for certain support services and crime risk protections for Peace Corps volunteers.