There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 18, United States Code, to protect pain-capable unborn children, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/16/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date
01/29/2018Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 51 - 46. Record Vote Number: 25.
Action By: Senate
01/29/2018Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (consideration: CR S527-545)
Action By: Senate
01/24/2018Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure presented in Senate. (CR S498)
Action By: Senate
01/24/2018Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S498)
Action By: Senate
01/17/2018Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 294.
Action By: Senate
01/16/2018Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (46)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK]* 01/16/2018
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 01/16/2018
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 01/16/2018
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 01/16/2018
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT]* 01/16/2018
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC]* 01/16/2018
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 01/16/2018
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 01/16/2018
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX]* 01/16/2018
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 01/16/2018
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 01/16/2018
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 01/16/2018
Sen. Sasse, Ben [R-NE]* 01/16/2018
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 01/16/2018
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA]* 01/16/2018
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA]* 01/16/2018
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC]* 01/16/2018
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 01/16/2018
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA]* 01/16/2018
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 01/16/2018
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD]* 01/16/2018
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 01/16/2018
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR]* 01/16/2018
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 01/16/2018
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 01/16/2018
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY]* 01/16/2018
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 01/16/2018
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 01/16/2018
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 01/16/2018
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 01/16/2018
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 01/16/2018
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 01/16/2018
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI]* 01/16/2018
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 01/16/2018
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ]* 01/16/2018
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 01/16/2018
Sen. Young, Todd C. [R-IN]* 01/16/2018
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK]* 01/16/2018
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 01/16/2018
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA]* 01/16/2018
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN]* 01/16/2018
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 01/16/2018
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 01/16/2018
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA]* 01/16/2018
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 01/16/2018
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 01/25/2018

Committees (0)

As of 12/12/2018 text has not been received for S.2311 - Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2311. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/16/2018)

Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act

This bill amends the federal criminal code to make it a crime for any person to perform or attempt to perform an abortion if the probable post-fertilization age of the fetus is 20 weeks or more.

A violator is subject to criminal penalties—a fine, up to five years in prison, or both.

The bill provides exceptions for an abortion: (1) that is necessary to save the life of the pregnant woman, or (2) when the pregnancy is the result of rape or incest. A physician who performs or attempts to perform an abortion under an exception must comply with specified requirements.

A woman who undergoes a prohibited abortion may not be prosecuted for violating or conspiring to violate the provisions of this bill.