There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Craft Beverage Modernization and Tax Reform Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to reform taxation of alcoholic beverages.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/30/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
01/30/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (56)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 01/30/2017
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 01/30/2017
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 01/30/2017
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 01/30/2017
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 01/30/2017
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 01/30/2017
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 01/30/2017
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 01/30/2017
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV]* 01/30/2017
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 01/30/2017
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO]* 01/30/2017
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 02/01/2017
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 02/15/2017
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 02/16/2017
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 02/16/2017
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 02/27/2017
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 02/27/2017
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 02/28/2017
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 03/01/2017
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 03/02/2017
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/13/2017
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 03/13/2017
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 03/15/2017
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/15/2017
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 03/21/2017
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 03/21/2017
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 03/27/2017
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 03/27/2017
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 04/05/2017
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 04/05/2017
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 04/06/2017
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 04/06/2017
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 04/24/2017
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 04/24/2017
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 04/24/2017
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA] 04/24/2017
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 04/26/2017
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 04/27/2017
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/27/2017
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 04/27/2017
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 04/27/2017
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/27/2017
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 05/02/2017
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 05/03/2017
Sen. Young, Todd C. [R-IN] 06/15/2017
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 08/01/2017
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 09/11/2017
Sen. Strange, Luther [R-AL] 09/25/2017
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 09/25/2017
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 10/18/2017
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA] 10/19/2017
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 11/02/2017
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 11/07/2017
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 11/13/2017
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 03/08/2018
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/09/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance01/30/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.236. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/30/2017)

Craft Beverage Modernization and Tax Reform Act of 2017

This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code, with respect to the tax treatment of certain alcoholic beverages, to:

  • exclude the aging period from the production period for beer, wine, or distilled spirits for purposes of determining whether a taxpayer can expense, rather than capitalize, interest costs paid or incurred during the production period;
  • reduce excise tax rates on beer and distilled spirits;
  • modify the small wine producer tax credit to increase the amount of the credit, expand the producers that are covered, and specify an adjustment for hard cider;
  • modify the alcohol content limitations that apply to certain wines for tax purposes;
  • specify definitions for "mead" and "low alcohol by volume wine;"
  • modify requirements for records, statements, and returns for certain breweries; and
  • permit the transfer of beer between bonded facilities without payment of tax.

The Department of the Treasury must amend applicable regulations with respect to the use of wholesome products suitable for human consumption in the production of fermented beverages.