There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to designate the Federal building and United States courthouse located at 200 West 2nd Street in Dayton, Ohio, as the "Walter H. Rice Federal Building and United States Courthouse".


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
12/13/2018Became Public Law No: 115-312. (TXT | PDF)
12/13/2018Signed by President.
12/06/2018Presented to President.
11/30/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H9748)
11/30/2018Committee on Transportation discharged.
06/07/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S3390; text: CR S3390)
05/23/2018Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso without amendment. Without written report.
02/06/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/13/2018Became Public Law No: 115-312. (TXT | PDF)
12/13/2018Signed by President.
12/06/2018SenatePresented to President.
11/30/2018-10:34amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/30/2018-10:34amHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H9748)
11/30/2018-10:34amHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9748)
11/30/2018-10:34amHouseMr. Shuster asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
11/30/2018HouseCommittee on Transportation discharged.
06/08/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
06/07/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
06/07/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/07/2018-6:22pmHouseReceived in the House.
06/07/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3390; text: CR S3390)
05/23/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 429.
05/23/2018SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso without amendment. Without written report.
05/22/2018SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
02/06/2018SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 02/06/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Environment and Public Works02/06/2018 Referred to
05/22/2018 Markup by
05/23/2018 Reported by
House Transportation and Infrastructure06/07/2018 Referred to
11/30/2018 Discharged from
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management06/08/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.2377. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-312 (12/13/2018)

(Sec. 1) This bill designates the federal building and U.S. courthouse located at 200 West 2nd Street in Dayton, Ohio, as the "Walter H. Rice Federal Building and United States Courthouse."