There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

FARM Act
Fair Agricultural Reporting Method Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Comprehensive Environmental Response, Compensation, and Liability Act of 1980 to provide an exemption from certain notice requirements and penalties for releases of hazardous substances from animal waste at farms.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/13/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date
03/08/2018Committee on Environment and Public Works Subcommittee on Superfund, Waste Management, and Regulatory Oversight. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 115-237.
Action By: Senate Environment and Public Works Subcommittee on Superfund, Waste Management, and Regulatory Oversight
02/13/2018Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (39)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN]* 02/13/2018
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 02/13/2018
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD]* 02/13/2018
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 02/13/2018
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND]* 02/13/2018
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 02/13/2018
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 02/13/2018
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL]* 02/13/2018
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 02/13/2018
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 02/13/2018
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA]* 02/13/2018
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 02/13/2018
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 02/13/2018
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 02/13/2018
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 02/13/2018
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 02/13/2018
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 02/13/2018
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN]* 02/13/2018
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 02/13/2018
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 02/13/2018
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 02/13/2018
Sen. Sasse, Ben [R-NE] 02/14/2018
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 02/15/2018
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 02/26/2018
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 02/27/2018
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 02/27/2018
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK] 02/28/2018
Sen. Young, Todd C. [R-IN] 02/28/2018
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 03/01/2018
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 03/05/2018
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 03/05/2018
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 03/07/2018
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 03/07/2018
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 03/08/2018
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 03/12/2018
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 03/12/2018
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 03/13/2018
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA] 03/19/2018
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 03/20/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Environment and Public Works02/13/2018 Referred to
Senate Environment and Public Works Subcommittee on Superfund, Waste Management, and Regulatory Oversight03/08/2018 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.