There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Sickle Cell Disease and Other Heritable Blood Disorders Research, Surveillance, Prevention, and Treatment Act of 2018

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Sickle Cell Disease and Other Heritable Blood Disorders Research, Surveillance, Prevention, and Treatment Act of 2018

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Sickle Cell Disease and Other Heritable Blood Disorders Research, Surveillance, Prevention, and Treatment Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Sickle Cell Disease and Other Heritable Blood Disorders Research, Surveillance, Prevention, and Treatment Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Sickle Cell Disease Research, Surveillance, Prevention, and Treatment Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Public Health Service Act to reauthorize a sickle cell disease prevention and treatment demonstration program and to provide for sickle cell disease research, surveillance, prevention, and treatment.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
12/18/2018Became Public Law No: 115-327. (TXT | PDF)
12/18/2018Signed by President.
12/13/2018Presented to President.
12/11/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H10052-10053)
10/11/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S6880; text: CR S6880)
08/15/2018Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
02/28/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
12/18/2018Became Public Law No: 115-327. (TXT | PDF)
12/18/2018Signed by President.
12/13/2018SenatePresented to President.
12/11/2018-1:32pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/11/2018-1:32pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H10052-10053)
12/11/2018-1:23pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2465.
12/11/2018-1:23pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10043-10052)
12/11/2018-1:23pmHouseMr. Burgess moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
10/16/2018-12:00pmHouseHeld at the desk.
10/16/2018-10:02amHouseReceived in the House.
10/12/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/11/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S6880; text: CR S6880)
08/15/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 553.
08/15/2018SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
07/25/2018SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
02/28/2018SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1288)

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ]* 02/28/2018
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 05/07/2018
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA] 05/16/2018
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/16/2018
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 05/16/2018
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 06/27/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions02/28/2018 Referred to
07/25/2018 Markup by
08/15/2018 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.2465. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-327 (12/18/2018)

Sickle Cell Disease and Other Heritable Blood Disorders Research, Surveillance, Prevention, and Treatment Act of 2018

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to authorize the Department of Health and Human Services to award grants to government, educational, and nonprofit entities for the purpose of supporting data collection and public health activities regarding heritable blood disorders, including sickle cell disease.

(Sec. 3) Additionally, the bill reauthorizes through FY2023 and revises the sickle cell disease grant program for federally-qualified health centers, nonprofit hospitals or clinics, and university health centers.