There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

STOP School Violence Act of 2018
Student, Teachers, and Officers Preventing School Violence Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to reauthorize the grant program for school security in the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/05/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date
03/14/2018Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/05/2018Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1340-1341)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (43)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 03/05/2018
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 03/05/2018
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 03/05/2018
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 03/05/2018
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT]* 03/05/2018
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 03/05/2018
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 03/05/2018
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 03/05/2018
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 03/05/2018
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 03/05/2018
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND]* 03/05/2018
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA]* 03/05/2018
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 03/05/2018
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV]* 03/05/2018
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 03/05/2018
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 03/05/2018
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 03/05/2018
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA]* 03/05/2018
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL]* 03/05/2018
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 03/05/2018
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME]* 03/05/2018
Sen. Young, Todd C. [R-IN]* 03/05/2018
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN]* 03/05/2018
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT]* 03/05/2018
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI]* 03/05/2018
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 03/07/2018
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 03/07/2018
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 03/08/2018
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 03/08/2018
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 03/12/2018
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/12/2018
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 03/12/2018
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 03/12/2018
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 03/12/2018
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 03/12/2018
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 03/19/2018
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK] 03/19/2018
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 03/19/2018
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 03/20/2018
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 03/20/2018
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 03/22/2018
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 03/22/2018
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 03/22/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary03/05/2018 Referred to
03/14/2018 Hearings by

As of 12/11/2018 no related bill information has been received for S.2495 - STOP School Violence Act of 2018.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2495. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (03/05/2018)

Student, Teachers, and Officers Preventing School Violence Act of 2018 or the STOP School Violence Act of 2018

This bill amends the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 to revise and reauthorize through FY2028 the Secure Our Schools grant program.