There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

United States-Israel Security Assistance Authorization Act of 2018

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

United States-Israel Security Assistance Authorization Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

United States-Israel Security Assistance Authorization Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

United States-Israel Security Assistance Authorization Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Foreign Assistance Act of 1961 and the Arms Export Control Act to make improvements to certain defense and security assistance provisions and to authorize the appropriations of funds to Israel, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
09/12/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
08/01/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
07/17/2018Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
03/05/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber
09/12/2018SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
09/12/2018-5:45pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/12/2018-5:45pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8145-8146)
09/12/2018-5:14pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2497.
09/12/2018-5:14pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8145-8150)
09/12/2018-5:14pmHouseMr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
08/03/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
08/03/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
08/03/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
08/03/2018-10:04amHouseReceived in the House.
08/02/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/01/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (text: CR S5570-5572)
08/01/2018SenateThe committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent.
08/01/2018SenateS.Amdt.3690 Amendment SA 3690 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
08/01/2018SenateS.Amdt.3690 Amendment SA 3690 proposed by Senator Gardner for Senator Rubio. (consideration: CR S5569-5570; text: CR S5569-5570) To make improvements to the bill.
08/01/2018SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S5567-5572)
07/17/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 519.
07/17/2018SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Relations
07/10/2018SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Relations
03/05/2018SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Cosponsors (72)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 03/05/2018
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 03/06/2018
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 03/06/2018
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/06/2018
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 03/06/2018
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 03/06/2018
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 03/06/2018
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 03/06/2018
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 03/07/2018
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/07/2018
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 03/07/2018
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 03/12/2018
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 03/12/2018
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/12/2018
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/12/2018
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 03/12/2018
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 03/13/2018
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA] 03/14/2018
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 03/14/2018
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 03/14/2018
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 03/20/2018
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 03/20/2018
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 03/20/2018
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 03/20/2018
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 04/09/2018
Sen. Young, Todd C. [R-IN] 04/18/2018
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/25/2018
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 05/07/2018
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 05/07/2018
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 05/08/2018
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 05/08/2018
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/08/2018
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 05/08/2018
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/08/2018
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 05/08/2018
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 05/09/2018
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 05/09/2018
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 05/10/2018
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 05/14/2018
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 05/14/2018
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 05/14/2018
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/14/2018
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 05/14/2018
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 05/14/2018
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 05/16/2018
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 05/17/2018
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 05/21/2018
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 05/23/2018
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 05/23/2018
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 06/06/2018
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 06/11/2018
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 06/11/2018
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS] 06/14/2018
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 06/14/2018
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 06/14/2018
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/18/2018
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/19/2018
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 06/19/2018
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 06/19/2018
Sen. Sasse, Ben [R-NE] 06/19/2018
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/21/2018
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 06/25/2018
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 06/25/2018
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK] 06/26/2018
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 06/26/2018
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 06/26/2018
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 06/26/2018
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 06/27/2018
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 06/28/2018
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 07/16/2018
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/26/2018
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 07/30/2018

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations03/05/2018 Referred to
07/10/2018 Markup by
07/17/2018 Reported by
House Foreign Affairs08/03/2018 Referred to
House Armed Services08/03/2018 Referred to
House Science, Space, and Technology08/03/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.