There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Medicare Access to Rehabilitation Services Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to repeal the Medicare outpatient rehabilitation therapy caps.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/01/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
02/01/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S596-597; text of measure as introduced: CR S597)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (37)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 02/01/2017
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 02/01/2017
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 02/01/2017
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 02/08/2017
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 02/08/2017
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 02/08/2017
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 02/10/2017
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 02/10/2017
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 02/10/2017
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 02/13/2017
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 02/14/2017
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 02/14/2017
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 02/14/2017
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 02/28/2017
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 02/28/2017
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 03/07/2017
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 03/07/2017
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 03/14/2017
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 03/30/2017
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 04/04/2017
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 04/07/2017
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 04/07/2017
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 04/25/2017
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/24/2017
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/24/2017
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 06/06/2017
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 07/11/2017
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 08/02/2017
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 09/06/2017
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 09/06/2017
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 09/06/2017
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA] 09/06/2017
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 09/12/2017
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 09/26/2017
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 10/17/2017
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 10/30/2017
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 01/03/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance02/01/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.253. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/01/2017)

Medicare Access to Rehabilitation Services Act of 2017

This bill repeals existing caps on Medicare payment for certain outpatient physical-therapy services and speech-language pathology services. Under current law, annual payment for such services is capped at $1,980 in 2017, with specified percentage increases to that limit in subsequent years.