There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Know the Lowest Price Act of 2018

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Know the Lowest Price Act of 2018

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Know the Lowest Price Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Know the Lowest Price Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Amended by Senate

A bill to amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to prohibit Medicare part D plans from restricting pharmacies from informing individuals regarding the prices for certain drugs and biologicals.

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to prohibit health plans and pharmacy benefit managers from restricting pharmacies from informing individuals regarding the prices for certain drugs and biologicals.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
10/10/2018Became Public Law No: 115-262. (TXT | PDF)
10/10/2018Signed by President.
10/04/2018Presented to President.
09/25/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8799)
09/04/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S6033)
09/04/2018Senate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent.
03/14/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (23)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/10/2018Became Public Law No: 115-262. (TXT | PDF)
10/10/2018Signed by President.
10/04/2018SenatePresented to President.
09/28/2018-4:24pmHouseCorrect Enrollment
09/25/2018-4:42pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/25/2018-4:42pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8799)
09/25/2018-4:27pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2553.
09/25/2018-4:27pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8799-8801)
09/25/2018-4:27pmHouseMr. Burgess moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/08/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/06/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
09/05/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/05/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/05/2018-12:09pmHouseReceived in the House.
09/05/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/04/2018SenateS.Amdt.4010 Amendment SA 4010 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
09/04/2018SenateS.Amdt.4010 Amendment SA 4010 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Stabenow. (consideration: CR S6033; text: CR S6033) To amend the title.
09/04/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6033)
09/04/2018SenateS.Amdt.4009 Amendment SA 4009 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
09/04/2018SenateS.Amdt.4009 Amendment SA 4009 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Stabenow. (consideration: CR S6033) To improve the bill.
09/04/2018SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6033)
09/04/2018SenateSenate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent.
03/14/2018SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Cosponsors (15)


Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance03/14/2018 Referred to
09/04/2018 Discharged from
House Energy and Commerce09/05/2018 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health09/08/2018 Referred to
House Ways and Means09/05/2018 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health09/06/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.2553. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-262 (10/10/2018)

Know the Lowest Price Act of 2018

(Sec. 2) This bill prohibits a prescription drug plan under Medicare or Medicare Advantage from restricting a pharmacy from informing an enrollee of any difference between the price, copayment, or coinsurance of a drug under the plan and a lower price of the drug without health-insurance coverage. (Such restrictions are commonly referred to as gag clauses.)