There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Patient Right to Know Drug Prices Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Patient Right to Know Drug Prices Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Patient Right to Know Drug Prices Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Patient Right to Know Drug Prices Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Patient Right to Know Drug Prices Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to ensure that health insurance issuers and group health plans do not prohibit pharmacy providers from providing certain information to enrollees.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
10/10/2018Became Public Law No: 115-263. (TXT | PDF)
10/10/2018Signed by President.
10/01/2018Presented to President.
09/25/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8795-8796)
09/17/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 98 - 2. Record Vote Number: 209.
07/31/2018Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
03/14/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/10/2018Became Public Law No: 115-263. (TXT | PDF)
10/10/2018Signed by President.
10/01/2018SenatePresented to President.
09/25/2018-4:26pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/25/2018-4:26pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8795-8796)
09/25/2018-4:05pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2554.
09/25/2018-4:05pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8795-8799)
09/25/2018-4:05pmHouseMr. Carter (GA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/20/2018-12:28pmHouseHeld at the desk.
09/20/2018-9:32amHouseReceived in the House.
09/18/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/17/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 98 - 2. Record Vote Number: 209.
09/17/2018SenateS.Amdt.4011 Amendment SA 4011 not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 11 - 89. Record Vote Number: 208.
09/17/2018SenateS.Amdt.4011 Amendment SA 4011 proposed by Senator Alexander for Senator Lee. (consideration: CR S6179; text: CR S6179) To limit application of the gag clause to self-insured group health plans.
09/17/2018SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6179-6180)
07/31/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 549.
07/31/2018SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
07/25/2018SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
03/14/2018SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Cosponsors (25)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions03/14/2018 Referred to
07/25/2018 Markup by
07/31/2018 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2554. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-263 (10/10/2018)

Patient Right to Know Drug Prices Act

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to prohibit a health insurance plan or pharmacy benefits manager from restricting a pharmacy from informing an enrollee of any difference between the out-of-pocket cost of a drug under the plan and the cost of the drug without health insurance coverage. (Such restrictions are commonly referred to as gag clauses.)

(Sec. 3) The bill also amends the Medicare Prescription Drug, Improvement, and Modernization Act of 2003 to apply certain antitrust filing requirements for generic drug applicants to biosimilar biological product applicants. (Biosimilar biological products, commonly referred to as biosimilars, are biological products approved by the Food and Drug Administration based on their similarity to an already-approved biological product.) Under current law, generic drug applicants that make agreements with brand name drug companies or other generic drug applicants regarding the manufacture, marketing, or sale of their drugs must file such agreements with the Federal Trade Commission and the Department of Justice. The bill subjects biosimilar biological product applicants to the same filing requirements.