There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Marrakesh Treaty Implementation Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Marrakesh Treaty Implementation Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Marrakesh Treaty Implementation Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Marrakesh Treaty Implementation Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Marrakesh Treaty Implementation Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 17, United States Code, to implement the Marrakesh Treaty, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (9)

Date Actions Overview
10/09/2018Became Public Law No: 115-261. (TXT | PDF)
10/09/2018Signed by President.
09/28/2018Presented to President.
09/25/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H8838)
09/25/2018Committee on the Judiciary discharged.
06/28/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S4810-4811; text: CR S4810-4811)
06/04/2018By Senator Grassley from Committee on the Judiciary filed written report. Report No. 115-261.
05/15/2018Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley without amendment. Without written report.
03/15/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/09/2018Became Public Law No: 115-261. (TXT | PDF)
10/09/2018Signed by President.
09/28/2018SenatePresented to President.
09/25/2018-7:19pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/25/2018-7:19pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H8838)
09/25/2018-7:18pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H8838)
09/25/2018-7:18pmHouseMr. Goodlatte asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
09/25/2018HouseCommittee on the Judiciary discharged.
07/03/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
07/03/2018-11:37amHouseReceived in the House.
06/29/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/28/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4810-4811; text: CR S4810-4811)
06/06/2018SenateStar Print ordered on report 115-261.
06/04/2018SenateAn errata sheet on written report No. 115-261 was printed.
06/04/2018SenateBy Senator Grassley from Committee on the Judiciary filed written report. Report No. 115-261.
05/15/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 414.
05/15/2018SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley without amendment. Without written report.
05/10/2018SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
04/18/2018SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
03/15/2018SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1766)

Cosponsors (13)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Judiciary03/15/2018 Referred to
04/18/2018 Hearings by
05/10/2018 Markup by
05/15/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-261
House Judiciary07/03/2018 Referred to
09/25/2018 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for S.2559.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.2559. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-261 (10/09/2018)

Marrakesh Treaty Implementation Act

(Sec. 2) This bill amends federal copyright law to implement the Marrakesh Treaty to Facilitate Access to Published Works for Persons Who Are Blind, Visually Impaired, or Otherwise Print Disabled (Marrakesh Treaty).

Specifically, it modifies the limitations and exceptions to federal copyright infringement that allow published works to be reproduced and distributed in accessible formats for individuals with print disabilities. The bill:

  • makes such limitations and exceptions applicable only to activities in the United States,
  • broadens the scope of published works that may be reproduced and distributed in accessible formats, and
  • modifies certain terms and definitions to conform with the Marrakesh Treaty.

Additionally, the bill adds a new section to allow published works in accessible formats to be exported and imported for individuals with print disabilities.