There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Children's Hospital GME Support Reauthorization Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Children's Hospital GME Support Reauthorization Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Children's Hospital GME Support Reauthorization Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Public Health Service Act to reauthorize the program of payments to children's hospitals that operate graduate medical education programs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
12/06/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
04/25/2018Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander without amendment. Without written report.
03/22/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (8)

Date Chamber
12/10/2018-5:48pmHouseHeld at the desk.
12/10/2018-2:09pmHouseReceived in the House.
12/10/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/06/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7365; text: CR S7365)
04/25/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 387.
04/25/2018SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander without amendment. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions
04/24/2018SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Action By: Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions
03/22/2018SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions03/22/2018 Referred to
04/24/2018 Markup by
04/25/2018 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.