There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

USE IT Act
Utilizing Significant Emissions with Innovative Technologies

Short Titles as Introduced

USE IT Act
Utilizing Significant Emissions with Innovative Technologies Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to support carbon dioxide utilization and direct air capture research, to facilitate the permitting and development of carbon capture, utilization, and sequestration projects and carbon dioxide pipelines, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/04/2018By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 115-328.
05/24/2018Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
03/22/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date
09/04/2018By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 115-328.
Action By: Senate
05/24/2018Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 435.
Action By: Senate
05/24/2018Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on Environment and Public Works
05/22/2018Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Action By: Committee on Environment and Public Works
04/11/2018Committee on Environment and Public Works. Hearings held.
Action By: Committee on Environment and Public Works
03/22/2018Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 03/22/2018
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV]* 03/22/2018
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND]* 03/22/2018
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 05/21/2018
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 06/19/2018
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 07/19/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Environment and Public Works03/22/2018 Referred to
04/11/2018 Hearings by
05/22/2018 Markup by
05/24/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-328

As of 11/19/2018 no related bill information has been received for S.2602 - USE IT Act.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.2602. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (05/24/2018)

Utilizing Significant Emissions with Innovative Technologies Act or the USE IT Act

This bill amends the Clean Air Act to require the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) to establish: (1) a competitive prize program for certain technology projects that capture carbon dioxide directly from the air, and (2) a Direct Air Capture Technology Advisory Board to advise the EPA on carrying out the program.

The EPA must: (1) carry out a research and development program for carbon dioxide utilization to promote technologies that transform carbon dioxide generated by industrial processes into a product of commercial value, and (2) support activities relating to carbon dioxide utilization by providing technical and financial assistance.

The bill amends the Fixing America's Surface Transportation Act to apply the Act's accelerated environmental review and permitting procedures to the construction of infrastructure that captures, utilizes, or sequesters carbon dioxide and the construction of carbon dioxide pipelines.

The Council on Environmental Quality (CEQ) must submit guidance to relevant federal agencies. The guidance must: (1) facilitate reviews associated with the deployment of carbon capture, utilization, and sequestration projects and carbon dioxide pipelines; and (2) support the efficient, orderly, and responsible development of the projects and pipelines.

The CEQ must also establish at least two regional task forces to: (1) identify permitting challenges that permitting authorities and project developers and operators face, and (2) improve the performance of the permitting process and regional coordination.