There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Postal Service Reform Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to improve postal operations, service, and transparency.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/22/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date
04/09/2018Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 366.
Action By: Senate
03/22/2018Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 03/22/2018
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND]* 03/22/2018
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 03/22/2018
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 06/13/2018
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 07/25/2018

Committees (0)

As of 02/20/2019 text has not been received for S.2629 - Postal Service Reform Act of 2018

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2629. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (03/22/2018)

Postal Service Reform Act of 2018

This bill directs the Office of Personnel Management to establish the Postal Service Health Benefits Program (PSHBP) within the Federal Employee Health Benefits Program for all postal employees and annuitants. All Medicare-eligible postal annuitants and employees enrolled in PSHBP must also enroll in Medicare, including parts A, B, and D.

The bill eliminates the existing statutory pension payment schedule, cancels any outstanding payments, and amortizes payments over 40 years.

The U.S. Postal Service (USPS) may establish a program to enter into agreements with an agency of any state government, local government, or tribal government to provide property and services on behalf of such agencies for non-commercial products and services. Distilled spirits, wine, or malt beverages shall be considered mailable if specified conditions apply.

The USPS shall submit to its Board of Governors: (1) a plan describing the actions it intends to take to achieve long-term solvency, and (2) a financial plan and budget consistent with that goal. The USPS must establish reasonable targets for performance to ensure that mail service for postal customers meets the service standards for market-dominant products.

There is established within USPS the position of Chief Innovation Officer. The USPS must submit to Congress and to the Postal Regulatory Commission a comprehensive strategy for maximizing revenues through innovative products and services.

The bill provides for emergency suspensions of post offices.

There is established in the USPS the Office of the Inspector General.