There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Stephen Michael Gleason Congressional Gold Medal Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Stephen Michael Gleason Congressional Gold Medal Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to award a Congressional Gold Medal to Stephen Michael Gleason.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
06/14/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
06/14/2018Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
04/11/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date Chamber
06/19/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
06/19/2018-2:10pmHouseReceived in the House.
06/15/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/14/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S3945)
06/14/2018SenateSenate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3945-3947)
04/11/2018SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Cosponsors (73)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA]* 04/11/2018
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 04/11/2018
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 04/12/2018
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/23/2018
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 04/23/2018
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 04/23/2018
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 04/23/2018
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 04/23/2018
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 04/23/2018
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 04/23/2018
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/23/2018
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 04/23/2018
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 04/23/2018
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 04/23/2018
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 04/23/2018
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 04/23/2018
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 04/23/2018
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 04/26/2018
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 04/26/2018
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 04/26/2018
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 04/26/2018
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 04/26/2018
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 04/26/2018
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/26/2018
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 04/26/2018
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 04/26/2018
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 04/26/2018
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR] 04/26/2018
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 05/07/2018
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/07/2018
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 05/07/2018
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 05/07/2018
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 05/07/2018
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 05/07/2018
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/07/2018
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 05/07/2018
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/10/2018
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 05/10/2018
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 05/10/2018
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 05/10/2018
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 05/10/2018
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 05/15/2018
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 05/15/2018
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/15/2018
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/15/2018
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS] 05/15/2018
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 05/17/2018
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 05/17/2018
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 05/17/2018
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 05/17/2018
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 05/17/2018
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 05/21/2018
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 05/21/2018
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 05/21/2018
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 05/23/2018
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/24/2018
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 05/24/2018
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 05/24/2018
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/24/2018
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 05/24/2018
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 06/04/2018
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 06/04/2018
Sen. Young, Todd C. [R-IN] 06/04/2018
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 06/04/2018
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/04/2018
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/05/2018
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 06/05/2018
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 06/06/2018
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 06/06/2018
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 06/06/2018
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 06/07/2018
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 06/07/2018
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 06/07/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs04/11/2018 Referred to
06/14/2018 Discharged from
House Financial Services06/19/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.2652. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (06/14/2018)

Stephen Michael Gleason Congressional Gold Medal Act

(Sec. 3) This bill directs the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the President pro tempore of the Senate to arrange for the award of a Congressional Gold Medal to Stephen Michael Gleason.