There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Asia Reassurance Initiative Act of 2018

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Asia Reassurance Initiative Act of 2018

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Asia Reassurance Initiative Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Asia Reassurance Initiative Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Asia Reassurance Initiative Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to develop a long-term strategic vision and a comprehensive, multifaceted, and principled United States policy for the Indo-Pacific region, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
12/31/2018Became Public Law No: 115-409.
12/31/2018Signed by President.
12/27/2018Presented to President.
12/19/2018Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to the House amendment to S. 2736 by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7865)
12/12/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H10130-10136)
12/04/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S7285-7291)
10/03/2018Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
04/24/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (23)

Date Chamber
12/31/2018Became Public Law No: 115-409.
12/31/2018Signed by President.
12/27/2018SenatePresented to President.
12/19/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/19/2018SenateSenate agreed to the House amendment to S. 2736 by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7865)
12/13/2018SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
12/12/2018-2:42pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/12/2018-2:42pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H10130-10136)
12/12/2018-2:27pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2736.
12/12/2018-2:26pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10130-10138)
12/12/2018-2:26pmHouseMs. Ros-Lehtinen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
12/06/2018-2:24pmHouseHeld at the desk.
12/06/2018-12:07pmHouseReceived in the House.
12/06/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/04/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7285-7291)
12/04/2018SenateThe committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7278-7284)
12/04/2018SenateS.Amdt.4068 Amendment SA 4068 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
12/04/2018SenateS.Amdt.4068 Amendment SA 4068 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Gardner. (consideration: CR S7284-7285; text: CR S7284-7285) To make technical edits to the bill.
12/04/2018SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7278-7291)
10/03/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 616.
10/03/2018SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
09/26/2018SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
04/24/2018SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations04/24/2018 Referred to
09/26/2018 Markup by
10/03/2018 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (96)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2736. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (04/24/2018)

Asia Reassurance Initiative Act of 2018

This bill provides for the promotion of U.S. values and diplomatic, security, and economic interests in the Indo-Pacific region. It includes statements of policy and measures concerning

  • security assistance and alliances;
  • the U.S. relationship with China, India, and the Association of Southeast Asian Nations;
  • the U.S. military presence in the region, as well as the pursuit of arms control;
  • security partnerships in southeast Asia;
  • the commitment to Taiwan;
  • a strategy regarding North Korea;
  • trade agreements and facilitation; and
  • the promotion of human rights and democracy in the region.