There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to nullify the effect of the recent executive order that temporarily restricted individuals from certain countries from entering the United States.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/01/2017 Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date
02/02/2017 Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 7.
Action By: Senate
02/01/2017 Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (46)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 02/01/2017
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 02/01/2017
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 02/01/2017
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 02/01/2017
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 02/01/2017
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 02/01/2017
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 02/01/2017
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD]* 02/01/2017
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT]* 02/01/2017
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 02/01/2017
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 02/01/2017
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 02/01/2017
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 02/01/2017
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA]* 02/01/2017
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 02/01/2017
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 02/01/2017
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM]* 02/01/2017
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH]* 02/01/2017
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 02/01/2017
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 02/01/2017
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV]* 02/01/2017
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA]* 02/01/2017
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA]* 02/01/2017
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 02/01/2017
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI]* 02/01/2017
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 02/01/2017
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 02/01/2017
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 02/01/2017
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ]* 02/01/2017
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 02/01/2017
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 02/01/2017
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 02/01/2017
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 02/01/2017
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME]* 02/01/2017
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 02/01/2017
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 02/01/2017
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 02/01/2017
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI]* 02/01/2017
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 02/01/2017
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL]* 02/01/2017
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 02/01/2017
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 02/02/2017
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 02/02/2017
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 02/02/2017
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 02/02/2017
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 02/06/2017

Committees (0)

As of 12/16/2017 text has not been received for S.274 - A bill to nullify the effect of the recent executive order that temporarily restricted individuals from certain countries from entering the United States.

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (18)

  • Africa
  • Border security and unlawful immigration
  • Congressional oversight
  • Immigration status and procedures
  • Iran
  • Iraq
  • Libya
  • Middle East
  • Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
  • Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
  • Religion
  • Somalia
  • Sudan
  • Syria
  • Travel and tourism
  • Visas and passports
  • Yemen

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.274. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/01/2017)

This bill rescinds the provisions of Executive Order 13769, entitled "Protecting the Nation from Foreign Terrorist Entry into the United States," effective as of January 27, 2017. Among the order's major provisions are restrictions on the entry of immigrants and nonimmigrants from seven countries (Iran, Iraq, Libya, Somalia, Sudan, Syria, and Yemen) and additional limitations on refugee admissions to the United States.