There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

VA Medicinal Cannabis Research Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to authorize the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to use the authority of the Secretary to conduct and support research on the efficacy and safety of medicinal cannabis, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/07/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
05/07/2018Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK]* 05/07/2018
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 06/21/2018
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 07/24/2018
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 07/24/2018
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 09/17/2018
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 10/11/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Veterans' Affairs05/07/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2796. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (05/07/2018)

VA Medicinal Cannabis Research Act of 2018

This bill authorizes the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to conduct and support research on the efficacy and safety of certain forms of cannabis and cannabis delivery for veterans enrolled in the VA health care system diagnosed with conditions such as chronic pain or post-traumatic stress disorder.

Collected data shall be preserved in a manner that facilitates further research.