There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

America's Water Infrastructure Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

America's Water Infrastructure Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide for the conservation and development of water and related resources, to authorize the Secretary of the Army to construct various projects for improvements to rivers and harbors of the United States, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/10/2018By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 115-294.
05/22/2018Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
05/08/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (7)

Date
07/10/2018By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 115-294.
Action By: Senate
05/22/2018Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 425.
Action By: Senate
05/22/2018Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on Environment and Public Works
05/22/2018Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Action By: Committee on Environment and Public Works
05/17/2018Committee on Environment and Public Works. Hearings held.
Action By: Committee on Environment and Public Works
05/09/2018Committee on Environment and Public Works. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-304.
Action By: Committee on Environment and Public Works
05/08/2018Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Action By: Senate

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Environment and Public Works05/08/2018 Referred to
05/09/2018 Hearings by
05/22/2018 Markup by
05/22/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-294

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.2800. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (05/22/2018)

America's Water Infrastructure Act of 2018

This bill requires the U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, each fiscal year, to submit to Congress a five-year budget and work plan for projects of national significance. Each Corps of Engineers district, each fiscal year, must submit a five-year budget and work plan for projects under its jurisdiction. Projects must be carried out in a sustainable manner that focuses on water resource challenges and opportunities, promotes collaboration, and pursues integrated water resource management.

The bill reauthorizes provisions of the Water Resources Reform and Development Act of 2014 pertaining to expedited consideration of water resources infrastructure through 2024.

The bill provides for: (1) the establishment of a Corps of Engineers Board of Appeals; and (2) various studies, modifications, and project authorizations and deauthorizations nationwide.

The Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) shall establish a voluntary stormwater infrastructure funding task force to develop recommendations to improve the funding and financing of stormwater infrastructure.

The Safe Drinking Water Act is amended to establish a voluntary WaterSense program to identify and promote water-efficient products, buildings, landscapes, facilities, processes, and services.

The Water Infrastructure Finance and Innovation Act of 2014 is amended to authorize the EPA to provide financial assistance to state infrastructure financing authorities for state loan funds to carry out water and wastewater infrastructure projects.

The EPA shall: (1) promote the use of green infrastructure; (2) carry out a Water Infrastructure Resiliency and Sustainability Program; and (3) appoint at least one employee in each regional office to serve as a liaison to minority, tribal, and low-income communities.