There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (13)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Music Modernization Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate for portions of this bill
  • AMP Act
  • Allocation for Music Producers Act
  • CLASSICS Act
  • Compensating Legacy Artists for their Songs, Service, and Important Contributions to Society Act
  • Musical Works Modernization Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Music Modernization Act

Short Titles as Introduced for portions of this bill
  • AMP Act
  • Allocation for Music Producers Act
  • CLASSICS Act
  • Compensating Legacy Artists for their Songs, Service, and Important Contributions to Society Act
  • Musical Works Modernization Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to modernize copyright law, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
09/17/2018By Senator Grassley from Committee on the Judiciary filed written report. Report No. 115-339.
09/12/2018Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
05/10/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
09/17/2018By Senator Grassley from Committee on the Judiciary filed written report. Report No. 115-339.
Action By: Senate
09/12/2018Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 569.
Action By: Senate
09/12/2018Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
06/28/2018Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
05/10/2018Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (80)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 05/10/2018
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 05/10/2018
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 05/10/2018
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 05/10/2018
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA]* 05/10/2018
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA]* 05/10/2018
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN]* 05/10/2018
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 05/10/2018
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 05/10/2018
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 05/10/2018
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 05/10/2018
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL]* 05/10/2018
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC]* 05/10/2018
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA]* 05/10/2018
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV]* 05/10/2018
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 05/10/2018
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 05/10/2018
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/14/2018
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 05/14/2018
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 05/14/2018
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 05/14/2018
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA] 05/15/2018
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 05/17/2018
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS] 05/21/2018
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 05/21/2018
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 05/21/2018
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/23/2018
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 05/24/2018
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/06/2018
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/20/2018
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 06/28/2018
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 07/10/2018
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 07/10/2018
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/17/2018
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 07/18/2018
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 07/23/2018
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 07/23/2018
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 07/26/2018
Sen. Young, Todd C. [R-IN] 07/30/2018
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 07/30/2018
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 07/31/2018
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 07/31/2018
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 08/01/2018
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 08/01/2018
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 08/01/2018
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 08/15/2018
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 08/15/2018
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 08/15/2018
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 08/15/2018
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 08/16/2018
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 08/20/2018
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 08/20/2018
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 08/22/2018
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 08/22/2018
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 08/22/2018
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 08/23/2018
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 08/23/2018
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 08/23/2018
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 08/23/2018
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 08/27/2018
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 08/27/2018
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 08/27/2018
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 08/28/2018
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 09/04/2018
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 09/04/2018
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 09/04/2018
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/04/2018
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 09/04/2018
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK] 09/04/2018
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 09/04/2018
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 09/12/2018
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 09/12/2018
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 09/12/2018
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 09/12/2018
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 09/12/2018
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 09/17/2018
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 09/17/2018
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 09/17/2018
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/17/2018
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/18/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary05/10/2018 Referred to
06/28/2018 Markup by
09/12/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-339

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2823. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (05/10/2018)

Music Modernization Act

This bill makes various changes to copyright law related to sound recordings, including providing protection for sound recordings fixed before February 15, 1972, creating a system for paying royalties to producers and sound engineers, and establishing a statutory blanket license for digital music services. The blanket license allows music services to distribute sound recordings covered by the license without negotiating for the rights for each individual recording, as long as the music service complies with the license's requirements, such as paying the required royalties.