There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Preventing Emerging Threats Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Preventing Emerging Threats Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to assist the Department of Homeland Security in preventing emerging threats from unmanned aircraft and vehicles, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
09/04/2018Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-332.
05/14/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date
09/13/2018Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Hearings held.
09/04/2018Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 564.
Action By: Senate
09/04/2018Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-332.
06/13/2018Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
06/06/2018Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-476.
05/14/2018Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 05/14/2018
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 05/14/2018
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND]* 05/14/2018
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR]* 05/14/2018
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA] 05/16/2018
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 05/16/2018
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 05/24/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs05/14/2018 Referred to
09/13/2018 Hearings by
06/13/2018 Markup by
09/04/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-332

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2836. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (05/14/2018)

Preventing Emerging Threats Act of 2018

This bill amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to authorize the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) and the Department of Justice (DOJ) to authorize their personnel to act to mitigate the threat that unmanned aircraft (i.e., drones) poses to the safety or security of facilities or assets, through a risk-based assessment.

DHS may take actions to:

  • detect, identify, monitor, and track the drone, without prior consent;
  • warn the drone's operator;
  • disrupt control of the drone, without prior consent;
  • seize or exercise control of the drone;
  • confiscate the drone; or
  • use reasonable force to disable, damage, or destroy the drone.

Any drone seized by DHS or DOJ is subject to forfeiture to the United States.

DHS shall: (1) evaluate the threat from drones to U.S. critical infrastructure and to domestic large hub airports; and (2) assess the threat of vehicular terrorism and its activities to support emergency response providers and the private sector to prevent, mitigate, and respond to vehicular terrorism.