There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the White Mountain Apache Tribe Water Rights Quantification Act of 2010 to clarify the use of amounts in the WMAT Settlement Fund.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
08/01/2018Became Public Law No: 115-227. (TXT | PDF)
08/01/2018Signed by President.
07/26/2018Presented to President.
07/23/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6629)
07/18/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
05/15/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
08/01/2018Became Public Law No: 115-227. (TXT | PDF)
08/01/2018Signed by President.
07/26/2018SenatePresented to President.
07/23/2018-5:45pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/23/2018-5:45pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6629)
07/23/2018-5:38pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2850.
07/23/2018-5:38pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6629-6630)
07/23/2018-5:38pmHouseMr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
07/19/2018-3:54pmHouseHeld at the desk.
07/19/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/19/2018-11:58amHouseReceived in the House.
07/18/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
07/18/2018SenateS.Amdt.3398 Amendment SA 3398 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
07/18/2018SenateS.Amdt.3398 Amendment SA 3398 proposed by Senator Rounds for Senator Flake. (consideration: CR S5074; text: CR S5074) In the nature of a substitute.
07/18/2018SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S5074)
05/16/2018SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 416.
05/15/2018SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2681)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 05/15/2018

Committees (0)

As of 05/20/2019 text has not been received for S.2850 - A bill to amend the White Mountain Apache Tribe Water Rights Quantification Act of 2010 to clarify the use of amounts in the WMAT Settlement Fund.

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


No related bill information was received for S.2850.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.2850. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-227 (08/01/2018)

(Sec. 1) This bill amends the White Mountain Apache Tribe Water Rights Quantification Act of 2010 to specify that settlement funds may be used for the planning, design, and construction of the tribe's rural water system.

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Act of August 9, 1955 (commonly known as the Long-Term Leasing Act) to expand the land of the Pueblo of Santa Clara and Ohkay Owingeh pueblo that may be leased for up to 99 years with the approval of the Department of the Interior, from lands held in trust, to all of the lands of the Pueblo of Santa Clara and Ohkay Owingeh pueblo.