There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

National Law Enforcement Museum Commemorative Coin Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require the Secretary of the Treasury to mint a coin in commemoration of the opening of the National Law Enforcement Museum in the District of Columbia, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/16/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
05/16/2018Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (69)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 05/16/2018
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 05/16/2018
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 05/16/2018
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 05/16/2018
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH]* 05/16/2018
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD]* 05/16/2018
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND]* 05/16/2018
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR]* 05/16/2018
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 05/16/2018
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 05/16/2018
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV]* 05/16/2018
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 05/16/2018
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 05/16/2018
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 05/16/2018
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 05/16/2018
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 05/16/2018
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO]* 05/16/2018
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN]* 05/16/2018
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 05/16/2018
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 05/16/2018
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 05/16/2018
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 05/16/2018
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/23/2018
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/24/2018
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 05/24/2018
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 05/24/2018
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 06/04/2018
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 06/13/2018
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 07/16/2018
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 07/18/2018
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 08/01/2018
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 08/15/2018
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 08/23/2018
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 10/11/2018
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 10/11/2018
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS] 10/11/2018
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 10/11/2018
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 10/11/2018
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 10/11/2018
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 10/11/2018
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 10/11/2018
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 10/11/2018
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 10/11/2018
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 10/11/2018
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 10/11/2018
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 10/11/2018
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 10/11/2018
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 10/11/2018
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK] 10/11/2018
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 10/11/2018
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA] 10/11/2018
Sen. Young, Todd C. [R-IN] 10/11/2018
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA] 10/11/2018
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 10/11/2018
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 10/11/2018
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 10/11/2018
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 10/11/2018
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 10/11/2018
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 10/11/2018
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 10/11/2018
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA] 10/11/2018
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 10/11/2018
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 10/11/2018
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 10/11/2018
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 10/11/2018
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 10/11/2018
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 10/11/2018
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 10/11/2018
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 11/13/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs05/16/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.