There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

National Law Enforcement Museum Commemorative Coin Act

Short Titles as Introduced

National Law Enforcement Museum Commemorative Coin Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require the Secretary of the Treasury to mint a coin in commemoration of the opening of the National Law Enforcement Museum in the District of Columbia, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
12/13/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.(text: CR S7623-7624)
12/13/2018Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7623-7624)
05/16/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date Chamber
12/19/2018-5:04pmHouseHeld at the desk.
12/19/2018-2:11pmHouseReceived in the House.
12/17/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/13/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (text: CR S7623-7624)
12/13/2018SenateSenate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7623-7624)
05/16/2018SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Cosponsors (69)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 05/16/2018
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 05/16/2018
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 05/16/2018
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 05/16/2018
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH]* 05/16/2018
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD]* 05/16/2018
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND]* 05/16/2018
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR]* 05/16/2018
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 05/16/2018
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 05/16/2018
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV]* 05/16/2018
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 05/16/2018
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 05/16/2018
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 05/16/2018
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 05/16/2018
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 05/16/2018
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO]* 05/16/2018
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN]* 05/16/2018
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 05/16/2018
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 05/16/2018
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 05/16/2018
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 05/16/2018
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/23/2018
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/24/2018
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 05/24/2018
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 05/24/2018
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 06/04/2018
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 06/13/2018
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 07/16/2018
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 07/18/2018
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 08/01/2018
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 08/15/2018
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 08/23/2018
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 10/11/2018
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 10/11/2018
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS] 10/11/2018
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 10/11/2018
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 10/11/2018
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 10/11/2018
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 10/11/2018
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 10/11/2018
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 10/11/2018
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 10/11/2018
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 10/11/2018
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 10/11/2018
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 10/11/2018
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 10/11/2018
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 10/11/2018
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK] 10/11/2018
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 10/11/2018
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA] 10/11/2018
Sen. Young, Todd C. [R-IN] 10/11/2018
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA] 10/11/2018
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 10/11/2018
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 10/11/2018
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 10/11/2018
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 10/11/2018
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 10/11/2018
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 10/11/2018
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 10/11/2018
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA] 10/11/2018
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 10/11/2018
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 10/11/2018
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 10/11/2018
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 10/11/2018
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 10/11/2018
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 10/11/2018
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 10/11/2018
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 11/13/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs05/16/2018 Referred to
12/13/2018 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2863. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (05/16/2018)

National Law Enforcement Museum Commemorative Coin Act

This bill directs the Department of the Treasury to mint and issue up to 50,000 $5 gold coins, 400,000 $1 silver coins, and 750,000 half-dollar clad coins that are emblematic of the National Law Enforcement Museum in Washington, DC, and the service and sacrifice of law enforcement officers throughout the history of the United States.

All sales of such coins shall include specified surcharges, which shall be distributed to the National Law Enforcement Officers Memorial Fund, Inc., for educational and outreach programs and exhibits.