There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (11)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Childhood Cancer STAR Act
Childhood Cancer Survivorship, Treatment, Access, and Research Act of 2018

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Childhood Cancer STAR Act
Childhood Cancer Survivorship, Treatment, Access, and Research Act of 2018

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Childhood Cancer STAR Act
Childhood Cancer Survivorship, Treatment, Access, and Research Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Childhood Cancer STAR Act
Childhood Cancer Survivorship, Treatment, Access, and Research Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Childhood Cancer STAR
Childhood Cancer Survivorship, Treatment, Access, and Research Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to maximize discovery, and accelerate development and availability, of promising childhood cancer treatments, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
06/05/2018Became Public Law No: 115-180.
06/05/2018Signed by President.
05/24/2018Presented to President.
05/22/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4350-4352)
03/22/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S1975-1977; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S1975-1977)
03/12/2018Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
02/02/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
06/05/2018Became Public Law No: 115-180.
06/05/2018Signed by President.
05/24/2018SenatePresented to President.
05/22/2018-3:51pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/22/2018-3:51pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4350-4352)
05/22/2018-3:23pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 292.
05/22/2018-3:22pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4349-4355)
05/22/2018-3:22pmHouseMr. Burgess moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
03/30/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/26/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
03/26/2018-4:01pmHouseReceived in the House.
03/23/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/22/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1975-1977; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S1975-1977)
03/12/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 342.
03/12/2018SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
02/28/2018SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
02/02/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S659)

Cosponsors (55)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV]* 02/02/2017
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD]* 02/02/2017
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 02/02/2017
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 03/21/2017
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 03/27/2017
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 04/25/2017
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 04/25/2017
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 05/03/2017
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/03/2017
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 05/03/2017
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 05/03/2017
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 05/03/2017
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/15/2017
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/15/2017
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA] 05/15/2017
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 05/15/2017
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA] 05/18/2017
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 05/18/2017
Sen. Young, Todd C. [R-IN] 06/05/2017
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/05/2017
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 09/12/2017
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 09/14/2017
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 09/14/2017
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 09/14/2017
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 10/25/2017
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 10/25/2017
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 01/08/2018
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 01/30/2018
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 01/30/2018
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 02/05/2018
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 02/05/2018
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 02/08/2018
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 02/08/2018
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 02/14/2018
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 02/14/2018
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 02/28/2018
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 02/28/2018
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 02/28/2018
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 02/28/2018
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 02/28/2018
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 02/28/2018
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 02/28/2018
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 02/28/2018
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 02/28/2018
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 02/28/2018
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/05/2018
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 03/07/2018
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 03/07/2018
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 03/15/2018
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 03/19/2018
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 03/20/2018
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/21/2018
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 03/22/2018
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 03/22/2018
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 03/22/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions02/02/2017 Referred to
02/28/2018 Markup by
03/12/2018 Reported by
House Energy and Commerce03/26/2018 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health03/30/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.292. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/02/2017)

Childhood Cancer Survivorship, Treatment, Access, and Research Act of 2017 or the Childhood Cancer STAR Act

This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to authorize the National Institutes of Health (NIH) to provide support to collect the medical specimens and information of children, adolescents, and young adults with selected cancers that have the least effective treatments in order to achieve a better understanding of these cancers and the effects of treatment.

The national childhood cancer registry is reauthorized through FY2022 and revised to authorize the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention to award grants to state cancer registries to improve tracking of childhood cancers.

The Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) may: (1) support pilot programs to develop or study models for monitoring and caring for childhood cancer survivors throughout their lives, (2) establish a task force to develop and test standards for high-quality childhood cancer survivorship care, and (3) carry out a demonstration project to improve care coordination as childhood cancer survivors transition to adult care.

HHS must convene a Workforce Development Collaborative on Medical and Psychosocial Care for Pediatric Cancer Survivors.

The NIH may support research on: (1) outcomes for, and barriers faced by, pediatric cancer survivors within minority or medically underserved populations; and (2) follow-up care for pediatric cancer survivors, including research on the late effects of cancer treatment and long-term complications.

The Government Accountability Office must make recommendations to address barriers to childhood cancer survivors obtaining and paying for adequate medical care.