There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (11)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Childhood Cancer STAR Act
Childhood Cancer Survivorship, Treatment, Access, and Research Act of 2018

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Childhood Cancer STAR Act
Childhood Cancer Survivorship, Treatment, Access, and Research Act of 2018

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Childhood Cancer STAR Act
Childhood Cancer Survivorship, Treatment, Access, and Research Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Childhood Cancer STAR Act
Childhood Cancer Survivorship, Treatment, Access, and Research Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Childhood Cancer STAR
Childhood Cancer Survivorship, Treatment, Access, and Research Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to maximize discovery, and accelerate development and availability, of promising childhood cancer treatments, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
06/05/2018Became Public Law No: 115-180. (TXT | PDF)
06/05/2018Signed by President.
05/24/2018Presented to President.
05/22/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4350-4352)
03/22/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S1975-1977; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S1975-1977)
03/12/2018Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
02/02/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
06/05/2018Became Public Law No: 115-180. (TXT | PDF)
06/05/2018Signed by President.
05/24/2018SenatePresented to President.
05/22/2018-3:51pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/22/2018-3:51pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4350-4352)
05/22/2018-3:23pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 292.
05/22/2018-3:22pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4349-4355)
05/22/2018-3:22pmHouseMr. Burgess moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
03/30/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/26/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
03/26/2018-4:01pmHouseReceived in the House.
03/23/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/22/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1975-1977; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S1975-1977)
03/12/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 342.
03/12/2018SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
02/28/2018SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
02/02/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S659)

Cosponsors (55)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV]* 02/02/2017
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD]* 02/02/2017
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 02/02/2017
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 03/21/2017
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 03/27/2017
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 04/25/2017
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 04/25/2017
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 05/03/2017
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/03/2017
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 05/03/2017
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 05/03/2017
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 05/03/2017
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/15/2017
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/15/2017
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA] 05/15/2017
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 05/15/2017
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA] 05/18/2017
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 05/18/2017
Sen. Young, Todd C. [R-IN] 06/05/2017
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/05/2017
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 09/12/2017
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 09/14/2017
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 09/14/2017
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 09/14/2017
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 10/25/2017
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 10/25/2017
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 01/08/2018
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 01/30/2018
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 01/30/2018
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 02/05/2018
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 02/05/2018
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 02/08/2018
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 02/08/2018
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 02/14/2018
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 02/14/2018
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 02/28/2018
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 02/28/2018
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 02/28/2018
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 02/28/2018
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 02/28/2018
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 02/28/2018
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 02/28/2018
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 02/28/2018
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 02/28/2018
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 02/28/2018
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/05/2018
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 03/07/2018
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 03/07/2018
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 03/15/2018
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 03/19/2018
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 03/20/2018
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/21/2018
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 03/22/2018
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 03/22/2018
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 03/22/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions02/02/2017 Referred to
02/28/2018 Markup by
03/12/2018 Reported by
House Energy and Commerce03/26/2018 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health03/30/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.292. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-180 (06/05/2018)

Childhood Cancer Survivorship, Treatment, Access, and Research Act of 2018 or the Childhood Cancer STAR Act

TITLE I--MAXIMIZING RESEARCH THROUGH DISCOVERY

Subtitle A--Caroline Pryce Walker Conquer Childhood Cancer Reauthorization Act

(Sec. 101) This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to authorize the National Institutes of Health (NIH) to provide support to collect the medical specimens and information of children, adolescents, and young adults with selected cancers that have the least effective treatments in order to achieve a better understanding of these cancers and the effects of treatment.

(Sec. 102) The national childhood cancer registry is reauthorized through FY2023 and revised to authorize the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention to award grants to state cancer registries to improve tracking of childhood cancers.

Subtitle B--Pediatric Expertise at NIH

(Sec. 111) The bill requires at least one member of the National Cancer Advisory Board, which advises the National Cancer Institute, to be knowledgeable in pediatric oncology.

Subtitle C--NIH Reporting on Childhood Cancer Activities

(Sec. 121) The NIH must ensure that information about supported childhood cancer research projects is included in appropriate congressional reports, including the Pediatric Research Initiative report.

TITLE II--MAXIMIZING DELIVERY: CARE, QUALITY OF LIFE, SURVIVORSHIP, AND CAREGIVER SUPPORT

(Sec. 201) The Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) may support pilot programs to develop or study models for monitoring and caring for childhood cancer survivors throughout their lives.

HHS must also review departmental activities relating to workforce development for health care providers who treat pediatric cancer patients and survivors.

(Sec. 202) The NIH may continue to support research relating to pediatric cancer survivorship, including outcomes for, and barriers faced by, pediatric cancer survivors within minority or medically underserved populations.

(Sec. 203) HHS may also support the development of best practices regarding childhood and adolescent cancer survivorship care.