There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Anti-Terrorism Clarification Act of 2018

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Anti-Terrorism Clarification Act of 2018

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Anti-Terrorism Clarification Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Anti-Terrorism Clarification Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Anti-Terrorism Clarification Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 18, United States Code, to clarify the meaning of the terms "act of war" and "blocked asset", and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
10/03/2018Became Public Law No: 115-253.
10/03/2018Signed by President.
09/24/2018Presented to President.
09/13/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
08/22/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
07/12/2018Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
05/24/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
10/03/2018Became Public Law No: 115-253.
10/03/2018Signed by President.
09/24/2018SenatePresented to President.
09/13/2018-4:01pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/13/2018-4:01pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H8245)
09/13/2018-4:01pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H8245)
09/13/2018-4:00pmHouseMr. Goodlatte asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
08/24/2018-11:56amHouseHeld at the desk.
08/24/2018-11:04amHouseReceived in the House.
08/23/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/22/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5864-5865; text: CR S5864-5865)
07/12/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 514.
07/12/2018SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/12/2018SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/24/2018SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2926-2927)

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary05/24/2018 Referred to
07/12/2018 Markup by
07/12/2018 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.