There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

MAP Broadband Act
Mobile Accuracy and Precision Broadband Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to reform the Mobility Fund Phase II challenge process conducted by the Federal Communications Commission.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/24/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
05/24/2018Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH]* 05/24/2018
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 05/24/2018
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 06/05/2018
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/05/2018
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA] 06/12/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation05/24/2018 Referred to

As of 10/15/2018 no related bill information has been received for S.2955 - MAP Broadband Act.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2955. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (05/24/2018)

Mobile Accuracy and Precision Broadband Act of 2018 or the MAP Broadband Act

This bill directs the Federal Communications Commission (FCC) to extend the period of the process under which a person may challenge the initial determination that an area is ineligible for Mobility Fund Phase II support (i.e., the challenge process) until November 27, 2018. The Mobility Fund is a program within the FCC's Universal Service Fund that provides monetary support for the deployment of mobile broadband service. Phase II of the fund provides monetary support over a 10-year period for mobile voice and broadband coverage in mostly rural areas.

The FCC must: (1) publicly disclose handsets (i.e., phones) approved for use in the challenge process to assist consumers in exploring potential challenges, (2) publish online monthly updates on the number of entities that it has approved to participate in the challenge process and the percentage of the total area initially determined to be ineligible for Mobility Fund Phase II support that has been challenged, and (3) publish annual updates on whether the deployment of mobile wireless service is being expanded in rural areas due to Mobility Fund Phase II support.