There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

PAST Act
Prevent All Soring Tactics Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Horse Protection Act to designate additional unlawful acts under the Act, strengthen penalties for violations of the Act, improve Department of Agriculture enforcement of the Act, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/24/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
05/24/2018Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (45)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 05/24/2018
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 05/24/2018
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 05/24/2018
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 05/24/2018
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 05/24/2018
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA]* 05/24/2018
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 05/24/2018
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT]* 05/24/2018
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA]* 05/24/2018
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/04/2018
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 06/04/2018
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 06/04/2018
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 06/06/2018
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/07/2018
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 06/07/2018
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 06/11/2018
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/11/2018
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 06/11/2018
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 06/11/2018
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 06/12/2018
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/18/2018
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA] 06/18/2018
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 06/26/2018
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 06/26/2018
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 07/10/2018
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 07/31/2018
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 09/17/2018
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 09/17/2018
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 09/17/2018
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 09/18/2018
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 09/24/2018
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 09/24/2018
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 10/02/2018
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 10/02/2018
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 10/02/2018
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 10/03/2018
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 10/04/2018
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 10/04/2018
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 10/04/2018
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 10/04/2018
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 10/09/2018
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 10/10/2018
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 10/10/2018
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 11/28/2018
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 12/05/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation05/24/2018 Referred to

As of 12/14/2018 no related bill information has been received for S.2957 - PAST Act.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2957. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (05/24/2018)

Prevent All Soring Tactics Act of 2018 or the PAST Act

This bill amends the Horse Protection Act to establish a new system for inspecting horses for soring, revise penalties for violations of the Act, and modify enforcement procedures. The soring of horses is any of various actions taken on a horse's limb to produce a higher gait that may cause pain, distress, inflammation, or lameness.

The Department of Agriculture (USDA) must establish requirements to license, train, assign, and oversee persons hired by the management of horse shows, exhibitions, sales, or auctions to detect and diagnose sore horses. A license may not be issued to a person with conflicts of interest, and USDA must give preference to veterinarians. USDA may revoke a license for unsatisfactory performance. USDA must assign licensed inspectors after receiving notice that management intends to hire the inspectors. An inspector must issue a citation for violations and notify USDA of violations. USDA must publish information on violations of this bill and disqualify a horse that is sore.

The bill prohibits a person in any horse show, exhibition, sale, or auction from causing or directing a horse to become sore for the purpose of showing, exhibiting, selling, or auctioning the horse.

The bill prohibits the use of specified devices on a Tennessee Walking, a Racking, or a Spotted Saddle horse at a show, exhibition, sale, or auction.

The bill increases the maximum criminal and civil liability penalties for certain violations. USDA may disqualify violators from specified activities related to horse shows, exhibitions, sales, and auctions.