There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Victims of Child Abuse Act Reauthorization Act of 2018

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Victims of Child Abuse Act Reauthorization Act of 2018

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Victims of Child Abuse Act Reauthorization Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Victims of Child Abuse Act Reauthorization Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Victims of Child Abuse Act Reauthorization Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to reauthorize subtitle A of the Victims of Child Abuse Act of 1990.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
01/07/2019Became Public Law No: 115-424. (TXT | PDF)
01/07/2019Signed by President.
12/27/2018Presented to President.
12/20/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 388 - 2 (Roll no. 453).(text: CR H10396-10398)
12/12/2018By Senator Grassley from Committee on the Judiciary filed written report. Report No. 115-432.
12/11/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S7450-7452)
09/18/2018Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
05/24/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (23)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/07/2019Became Public Law No: 115-424. (TXT | PDF)
01/07/2019Signed by President.
12/27/2018SenatePresented to President.
12/20/2018-2:16pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/20/2018-2:16pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 388 - 2 (Roll no. 453). (text: CR H10396-10398)
12/20/2018-2:12pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10433-10434)
12/20/2018-12:14pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/20/2018-12:10pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2961.
12/20/2018-12:10pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10396-10401)
12/20/2018-12:09pmHouseMr. Collins (GA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/12/2018SenateBy Senator Grassley from Committee on the Judiciary filed written report. Report No. 115-432.
12/12/2018-5:06pmHouseHeld at the desk.
12/12/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/12/2018-4:45pmHouseReceived in the House.
12/11/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7450-7452)
12/11/2018SenateThe committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7449-7450; text: CR S7449-7450)
12/11/2018SenateS.Amdt.4074 Amendment SA 4074 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
12/11/2018SenateS.Amdt.4074 Amendment SA 4074 proposed by Senator Perdue for Senator Blunt. (consideration: CR S7450; text: CR S7450) To adjust the authorization of appropriations.
12/11/2018SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7449-7452)
09/18/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 581.
09/18/2018SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
09/13/2018SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
05/24/2018SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Cosponsors (21)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary05/24/2018 Referred to
09/13/2018 Markup by
09/18/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-432

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2961. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-424 (01/07/2019)

Victims of Child Abuse Act Reauthorization Act of 2018

(Sec. 2) This bill reauthorizes for FY2019-FY2023 grants for local and regional children's advocacy centers (CACs), as well as for technical assistance and training. CACs coordinate a multidisciplinary response to child abuse.

The bill adds a new finding specifying the need for state chapters of CAC networks (1) to help local communities coordinate their multidisciplinary services, and (2) to provide oversight of, and training and technical assistance in, the effective delivery of evidence-informed programming.

It modifies grants for regional CACs, including

  • to add, as a new program objective, collaboration with state chapters; and
  • to require regional CACs to assist local CACs, multidisciplinary teams, and state chapters, in addition to communities.

It also modifies grants for local CACs, including

  • to add, as a new grant purpose, promoting the effective delivery of the evidence-informed Children's Advocacy Model and the multidisciplinary response to child abuse;
  • to allow grants to support direct services for victims of human trafficking, in addition to victims of child pornography; and
  • to require a portion of grants to be distributed to state chapters.

The Department of Justice must report annually on efforts to monitor and evaluate the program activities of regional CACs and the extent to which both urban and rural populations are served by the regional CAC program.

(Sec. 3) The bill provides immunity from civil and criminal liability under federal, state, and local law for people who make good-faith reports of child abuse or neglect or who provide related information or assistance.