There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

John P. Smith Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

John P. Smith Act

Short Titles as Introduced

John P. Smith Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to enhance tribal road safety, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
11/29/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7490-7491; text: CR S7490-7491)
04/06/2017Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven without amendment. With written report No. 115-27.
02/03/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (8)

Date Chamber
11/30/2017-6:29pmHouseHeld at the desk.
11/30/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/30/2017-2:55pmHouseReceived in the House.
11/29/2017SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7490-7491; text: CR S7490-7491)
04/06/2017SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 33.
04/06/2017SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven without amendment. With written report No. 115-27.
02/08/2017SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported favorably.
02/03/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S680-681)

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 02/03/2017
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 02/07/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Indian Affairs02/03/2017 Referred to
04/06/2017 Reported by S. Rept. 115-27

No related bill information was received for S.302.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.302. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (11/29/2017)

John P. Smith Act

(Sec. 3) This bill modifies the approval process under the National Environmental Policy Act (NEPA) for tribal transportation safety projects to categorically exclude qualifying projects from requirements to conduct environmental assessments and environmental impact statements. A tribal transportation safety project is one that is eligible for assistance under the tribal transportation program and that: (1) corrects or improves a hazardous road location or feature, or (2) addresses a highway safety problem.

The Department of the Interior must: (1) review existing Federal Highway Administration categorical exclusions to determine applicability to tribal transportation program projects, and (2) identify tribal transportation safety projects that meet general categorical exclusion requirements. Interior must establish categorical exclusions for tribal projects consistent with its findings.

The bill prescribes requirements for the expedited review and approval of tribal transportation safety projects under NEPA or other federal laws.

(Sec. 4) Interior must enter into five-year programmatic agreements with Indian tribes that establish efficient administrative procedures for carrying out environmental reviews for tribal transportation program projects. An agreement may allow a tribe to determine whether a project is categorically excluded from the preparation of an environmental assessment or impact statement under NEPA.