There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Keep Families Together Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to limit the separation of families at or near ports of entry.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/07/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
06/07/2018Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (48)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 06/07/2018
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA]* 06/07/2018
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 06/07/2018
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 06/07/2018
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 06/07/2018
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 06/07/2018
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 06/07/2018
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 06/07/2018
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 06/07/2018
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 06/07/2018
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 06/07/2018
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 06/07/2018
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 06/07/2018
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 06/07/2018
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 06/07/2018
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 06/07/2018
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 06/07/2018
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 06/07/2018
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI]* 06/07/2018
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT]* 06/07/2018
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 06/07/2018
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME]* 06/07/2018
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA]* 06/07/2018
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 06/07/2018
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA]* 06/07/2018
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ]* 06/07/2018
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV]* 06/07/2018
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 06/07/2018
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM]* 06/07/2018
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 06/07/2018
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 06/07/2018
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/11/2018
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/11/2018
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 06/11/2018
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 06/13/2018
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 06/13/2018
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 06/13/2018
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 06/14/2018
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 06/14/2018
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/18/2018
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/18/2018
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 06/18/2018
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 06/18/2018
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 06/18/2018
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 06/18/2018
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 06/18/2018
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 06/18/2018
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 06/18/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Judiciary06/07/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.3036. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/07/2018)

Keep Families Together Act

This bill prohibits an agent or contractor of the Department of Homeland Security, the Department of Justice, or the Department of Health and Human Services from removing a child who is under the age of 18 and has no permanent immigration status from his or her parent or legal guardian at or near the port of entry or within 100 miles of the U.S. border unless:

  • an authorized state court determines that it is in the child's best interests to be removed;
  • a state or county child welfare official with expertise in child trauma and development determines that it is in the child's best interests to be removed because of abuse or neglect; or
  • the Chief Patrol Agent or the Area Port Director authorizes separation based on a documented finding that the child is a trafficking victim or is at significant risk of becoming a victim, a strong likelihood exists that the adult is not the parent or legal guardian, or the child is in danger of abuse or neglect.

An agency may not remove a child from a parent or legal guardian solely for the policy goals of deterring migration to the United States or of promoting immigration law compliance.

The bill sets forth presumptions: (1) in favor of family and sibling unity and parental rights, and (2) that detention is not in the best interests of families and children.

The Government Accountability Office shall conduct a study of the prosecution of asylum seekers.