There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Vietnam War Veterans Recognition Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Vietnam War Veterans Recognition Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 4, United States Code, to encourage the display of the flag of the United States on National Vietnam War Veterans Day.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
03/28/2017Became Public Law No: 115-15. (TXT | PDF)
03/28/2017Signed by President.
03/23/2017Presented to President.
03/21/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by voice vote.(text of measure as passed: CR H2267)
03/21/2017Committee on the Judiciary discharged.
02/03/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S683; text as passed Senate: CR S683)
02/03/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber All Actions
03/28/2017Became Public Law No: 115-15. (TXT | PDF)
03/28/2017Signed by President.
03/23/2017SenatePresented to President.
03/21/2017-2:41pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/21/2017-2:41pmHouseOn passage Passed by voice vote. (text of measure as passed: CR H2267)
03/21/2017-2:41pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H2267)
03/21/2017HouseCommittee on the Judiciary discharged.
03/21/2017-2:41pmHouseMr. Goodlatte asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
03/16/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/16/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/14/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/06/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
02/06/2017-2:05pmHouseReceived in the House.
02/03/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
02/03/2017SenateIntroduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S683; text as passed Senate: CR S683)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN]* 02/03/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary02/06/2017 Referred to
03/16/2017 Markup by
03/21/2017 Discharged from
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution and Civil Justice02/14/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.305.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.305. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-15 (03/28/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the Senate passed version is repeated here.)

Vietnam War Veterans Recognition Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill includes National Vietnam War Veterans Day, March 29, among those days on which the flag should especially be displayed.