There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

21st Century IDEA
21st Century Integrated Digital Experience Act

Short Titles as Introduced

21st Century IDEA
21st Century Integrated Digital Experience Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to improve executive agency digital services, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
12/05/2018Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-418.
06/12/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
12/05/2018Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 723.
Action By: Senate
12/05/2018Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-418.
09/26/2018Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
06/12/2018Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 09/25/2018
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 11/15/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs06/12/2018 Referred to
09/26/2018 Markup by
12/05/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-418

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.3050. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/12/2018)

21st Century Integrated Digital Experience Act or the 21st Century IDEA

This bill requires an executive agency that maintains a website or digital service that is made available to the public to:

  • eliminate or consolidate websites or web pages that are duplicative or overlapping;
  • ensure that each public-facing website and digital service has a consistent appearance;
  • ensure that each website, web-based form, and web-based application is accessible to individuals with disabilities;
  • ensure that each website or digital service contains a search function that allows users to easily search content intended for public use;
  • provide the website or digital service through an industry standard secure connection;
  • ensure that each website or digital service is designed around user needs; and
  • ensure that users of the website or digital service have the option for a more customized digital experience.

Any agency website that is made available to the public after this bill's enactment shall be in compliance with website standards of the General Services Administration's Technology Transformation Services.

Each agency shall make available to the public an online, mobile-friendly, digital service option for any in-person government transaction or paper-based process in a manner that decreases cost, increases digital conversion rates, and improves customer experience.

Each agency shall submit to the Office of Management and Budget and Congress a plan to accelerate the use of electronic signature standards.

Each agency's Chief Information Officer must meet specified requirements related to coordinating the customer experience and digital service delivery.