There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Legislative Branch Appropriations Act, 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Legislative Branch Appropriations Act, 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

An original bill making appropriations for the Legislative Branch for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2019, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
06/14/2018Committee on Appropriations. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Daines. With written report No. 115-274.
06/14/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date
06/14/2018Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 450.
Action By: Senate
06/14/2018Committee on Appropriations. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Daines. With written report No. 115-274.
05/15/2018Committee on Appropriations Senate Subcommittee on Legislative Branch. Hearings held prior to introduction and/or referral. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-411.
Action By: Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Legislative Branch
05/08/2018Committee on Appropriations Senate Subcommittee on Legislative Branch. Hearings held prior to introduction and/or referral. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-411.
Action By: Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Legislative Branch
04/25/2018Committee on Appropriations Senate Subcommittee on Legislative Branch. Hearings held prior to introduction and/or referral. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-411.
Action By: Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Legislative Branch

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Appropriations06/14/2018 Reported original measure S. Rept. 115-274
Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Legislative Branch05/15/2018 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.3071. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate without amendment (06/14/2018)

Legislative Branch Appropriations Act, 2019

Provides FY2019 appropriations for the legislative branch, including the Senate and Joint Items such as:

  • the Joint Economic Committee,
  • the Joint Committee on Taxation,
  • the Office of the Attending Physician, and
  • the Office of Congressional Accessibility Services.

Provides FY2019 appropriations for:

  • the Capitol Police;
  • the Office of Compliance;
  • the Congressional Budget Office;
  • the Architect of the Capitol;
  • the Library of Congress, including the Congressional Research Service and the Copyright Office;
  • the Government Publishing Office;
  • the Government Accountability Office;
  • the Open World Leadership Center Trust Fund; and
  • the John C. Stennis Center for Public Service Training and Development.

(Pursuant to the longstanding practice of each chamber of Congress determining its own requirements, funds for the House are not included in the Senate bill.)

Sets forth permissible and prohibited uses for funds provided by this bill.