There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Keep Families Together and Enforce the Law Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Immigration and Nationality Act to address the protective custody of alien children accompanied by parents, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/20/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date
06/21/2018Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 477.
Action By: Senate
06/20/2018Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (39)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 06/20/2018
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 06/20/2018
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 06/20/2018
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI]* 06/20/2018
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 06/20/2018
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR]* 06/20/2018
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX]* 06/20/2018
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 06/20/2018
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK]* 06/20/2018
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 06/20/2018
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ]* 06/20/2018
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA]* 06/20/2018
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 06/20/2018
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 06/20/2018
Sen. Sasse, Ben [R-NE]* 06/20/2018
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 06/20/2018
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 06/20/2018
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT]* 06/20/2018
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 06/20/2018
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 06/20/2018
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN]* 06/20/2018
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 06/20/2018
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 06/20/2018
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 06/20/2018
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA]* 06/20/2018
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 06/20/2018
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 06/20/2018
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC]* 06/20/2018
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA]* 06/20/2018
Sen. Young, Todd C. [R-IN]* 06/20/2018
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 06/20/2018
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA]* 06/20/2018
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 06/21/2018
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 06/21/2018
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 06/21/2018
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 06/21/2018
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 06/25/2018
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 06/28/2018
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS] 06/28/2018

Committees (0)

As of 02/24/2019 text has not been received for S.3093 - Keep Families Together and Enforce the Law Act

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.3093. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/20/2018)

Keep Families Together and Enforce the Law Act

This bill amends the Immigration and Nationality Act to authorize the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to extend protective custody over alien children under age 18 who are accompanied by a parent and apprehended at the border or are seeking admission to the United States at a port of entry. DHS must temporarily house an alien child under age 18 in a family residential center during the pendency of civil or criminal proceedings.

DHS must increase the number of available beds in family residential centers. The Department of Justice must increase the number of immigration judge teams to conduct prioritized proceedings for accompanied alien children and families apprehended at the southwest border or who are seeking admission to the United States at a port of entry.