There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

National Quantum Initiative Act

Short Titles as Introduced

National Quantum Initiative Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide for a coordinated Federal program to accelerate quantum research and development for the economic and national security of the United States.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
11/27/2018Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-389.
06/26/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date
11/27/2018Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 676.
Action By: Senate
11/27/2018Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-389.
08/01/2018Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
06/26/2018Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 06/26/2018
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 07/31/2018
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA] 07/31/2018
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 09/27/2018
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 09/27/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation06/26/2018 Referred to
08/01/2018 Markup by
11/27/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-389

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.3143. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (11/27/2018)

National Quantum Initiative Act

This bill directs the President to implement a National Quantum Initiative Program to, among other things, establish the goals and priorities for a 10-year plan to accelerate the development of quantum information science and technology applications.

The bill defines "quantum information science" as the use of quantum mechanics for the storage, transmission, manipulation, or measurement of information in ways that offer advantages to classical capabilities.

The National Science and Technology Council shall establish a Subcommittee on Quantum Information Science, including membership from the National Institute of Standards and Technology (NIST) and the National Aeronautics and Space Administration (NASA) to guide program activities.

The President must establish a National Quantum Initiative Advisory Committee to advise the President and subcommittee on the program and quantum information science trends and developments.

NIST shall carry out specified quantum science activities and convene a consortium to discuss the development of a quantum information science and technology industry.

The National Science Foundation shall:

  • carry out a basic research and education program on quantum information science and engineering, and
  • award grants for the establishment of Multidisciplinary Centers for Quantum Research and Education.