There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

CyberTipline Modernization Act of 2018

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

CyberTipline Modernization Act of 2018

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

CyberTipline Modernization Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

CyberTipline Modernization Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

CyberTipline Modernization Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 18, United States Code, to make certain changes to the reporting requirement of certain service providers regarding child sexual exploitation visual depictions, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
12/21/2018Became Public Law No: 115-395. (TXT | PDF)
12/21/2018Signed by President.
12/20/2018Presented to President.
12/12/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H10153-10155)
12/12/2018Committee on the Judiciary discharged.
09/27/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/18/2018Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley without amendment. Without written report.
06/28/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber
12/21/2018Became Public Law No: 115-395. (TXT | PDF)
12/21/2018Signed by President.
12/20/2018SenatePresented to President.
12/12/2018-4:22pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/12/2018-4:22pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H10153-10155)
12/12/2018-4:22pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H10153-10155)
12/12/2018HouseCommittee on the Judiciary discharged.
12/12/2018-4:21pmHouseMr. Goodlatte asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
09/28/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
09/28/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/28/2018-11:11amHouseReceived in the House.
09/27/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/27/2018SenateS.Amdt.4023 Amendment SA 4023 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
09/27/2018SenateS.Amdt.4023 Amendment SA 4023 proposed by Senator Perdue for Senator Grassley. (consideration: CR S6364) In the nature of a substitute.
09/27/2018SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6364)
09/18/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 582.
09/18/2018SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley without amendment. Without written report.
09/13/2018SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
06/28/2018SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4738-4740)

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary06/28/2018 Referred to
09/13/2018 Markup by
09/18/2018 Reported by
House Judiciary09/28/2018 Referred to
12/12/2018 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.