There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Restore Our Parks Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Restore Our Parks Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 54, United States Code, to establish, fund, and provide for the use of amounts in a National Park Service Legacy Restoration Fund to address the maintenance backlog of the National Park Service, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
12/06/2018By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-423.
12/04/2018Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
06/28/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date
12/06/2018By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-423.
Action By: Senate
12/04/2018Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 713.
Action By: Senate
12/04/2018Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
10/02/2018Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
07/11/2018Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks
06/28/2018Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Action By: Senate

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources06/28/2018 Referred to
10/02/2018 Markup by
12/04/2018 Reported by
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks07/11/2018 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.