There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Justice for Victims of Lynching Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Justice for Victims of Lynching Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 18, United States Code, to specify lynching as a deprivation of civil rights, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
12/19/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.(text: CR S7843-7844)
12/19/2018Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
06/28/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/19/2018-9:21pmHouseHeld at the desk.
12/19/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/19/2018-8:13pmHouseReceived in the House.
12/19/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (text: CR S7843-7844)
12/19/2018SenateS.Amdt.4168 Amendment SA 4168 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
12/19/2018SenateS.Amdt.4168 Amendment SA 4168 proposed by Senator Harris for Senator Booker. (consideration: CR S7843; text: CR S7935-7936) In the nature of a substitute.
12/19/2018SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7843-7844)
12/19/2018SenateSenate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
10/11/2018SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
06/28/2018SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Cosponsors (39)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC]* 06/28/2018
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ]* 06/28/2018
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 06/28/2018
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 06/28/2018
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 06/28/2018
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 06/28/2018
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 06/28/2018
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA]* 06/28/2018
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD]* 06/28/2018
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 06/28/2018
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 06/28/2018
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL]* 06/28/2018
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME]* 06/28/2018
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 06/28/2018
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 06/28/2018
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 06/28/2018
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 06/28/2018
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 06/28/2018
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 06/28/2018
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 06/28/2018
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 06/28/2018
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH]* 06/28/2018
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 07/09/2018
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 07/11/2018
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 07/30/2018
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 08/01/2018
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 09/12/2018
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 09/25/2018
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 09/25/2018
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 10/11/2018
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 10/11/2018
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 10/11/2018
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 10/11/2018
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 10/11/2018
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 11/13/2018
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 11/13/2018
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 11/26/2018
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 12/04/2018
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 12/19/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary06/28/2018 Referred to
10/11/2018 Markup by
12/19/2018 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for S.3178.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.3178. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/28/2018)

Justice for Victims of Lynching Act of 2018

This bill specifies that an offense involving lynching is a criminal civil rights violation. A violator is subject to criminal penalties—a prison term, a fine, or both.