There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Civil Rights Cold Case Records Collection Act of 2018

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Civil Rights Cold Case Records Collection Act of 2018

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Civil Rights Cold Case Records Collection Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Civil Rights Cold Case Records Collection Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Civil Rights Cold Case Records Collection Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide for the expeditious disclosure of records related to civil rights cold cases, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
01/08/2019Became Public Law No: 115-426. (TXT | PDF)
01/08/2019Signed by President.
12/27/2018Presented to President.
12/21/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 376 - 6 (Roll no. 482).(text: CR H10527-10531)
12/17/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
12/10/2018Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-424.
07/10/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber
01/08/2019Became Public Law No: 115-426. (TXT | PDF)
01/08/2019Signed by President.
12/27/2018SenatePresented to President.
12/21/2018-10:44amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/21/2018-10:44amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 376 - 6 (Roll no. 482). (text: CR H10527-10531)
12/21/2018-10:41amHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10537-10538)
12/21/2018-9:33amHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/21/2018-9:32amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3191.
12/21/2018-9:32amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10527-10531)
12/21/2018-9:31amHouseMr. Walker moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/19/2018-5:04pmHouseHeld at the desk.
12/19/2018-2:12pmHouseReceived in the House.
12/18/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/17/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
12/17/2018SenateS.Amdt.4153 Amendment SA 4153 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
12/17/2018SenateS.Amdt.4153 Amendment SA 4153 proposed by Senator Crapo for Senator Jones. (consideration: CR S7731-7734) In the nature of a substitute.
12/17/2018SenateThe committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7727-7731; text as reported in Senate: CR S7727-7734)
12/17/2018SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7727-7731)
12/10/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 727.
12/10/2018SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-424.
09/26/2018SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
07/10/2018SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S4877-4878)

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 07/10/2018
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA]* 07/10/2018
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 07/26/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs07/10/2018 Referred to
09/26/2018 Markup by
12/10/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-424

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.3191. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-426 (01/08/2019)

Civil Rights Cold Case Records Collection Act of 2018

This bill requires the National Archives and Records Administration (NARA) to: (1) establish a collection of civil rights cold case records; (2) prepare and publish the subject guidebook and index to the collection; and (3) establish criteria for transmitting copies of civil rights cold case records to NARA, to include required metadata.

All civil rights cold case records transmitted to NARA for disclosure to the public shall be included in the collection, available to the public for inspection and copying, and prioritized for digitization by NARA.

The bill requires redacted records or records for which public disclosure is postponed to be reviewed annually.

The bill enumerates grounds for which disclosure of records may be postponed, including causing damage to national security, invading personal privacy, or interfering with ongoing law enforcement proceedings.

The bill establishes the Civil Rights Cold Case Records Review Board as an independent agency of impartial private citizens. The board shall consider and render decisions on determinations to seek postponement of disclosure of civil rights cold case records. With the exception of certain administrative records, records of the review board shall not be destroyed.

The review board may request the Department of Justice to petition any court in the United States or abroad to release information relevant to civil rights cold cases held under seal of court. A similar request may be made to a court in the United States for release of information held under an injunction of grand-jury secrecy.