There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Pet and Women Safety Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to protect victims of domestic violence, sexual assault, stalking, and dating violence from emotional and psychological trauma caused by acts of violence or threats of violence against their pets.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/07/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
02/07/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (41)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 02/07/2017
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 03/29/2017
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/29/2017
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/06/2017
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/24/2017
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/24/2017
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 04/24/2017
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 04/24/2017
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 04/27/2017
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 05/10/2017
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 05/23/2017
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 05/24/2017
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 06/19/2017
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 07/10/2017
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 08/01/2017
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 08/01/2017
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 08/02/2017
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 09/07/2017
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 09/14/2017
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 09/14/2017
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 09/19/2017
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 10/03/2017
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 10/05/2017
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 10/05/2017
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 10/16/2017
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 10/23/2017
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 10/23/2017
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 10/24/2017
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 10/30/2017
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 11/02/2017
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 11/15/2017
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA] 11/16/2017
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 11/27/2017
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 11/30/2017
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 12/12/2017
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 01/03/2018
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA] 01/24/2018
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 08/01/2018
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 09/25/2018
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 10/01/2018
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 10/10/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry02/07/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.322. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/07/2017)

Pet and Women Safety Act of 2017

This bill amends the federal criminal code to broaden the definition of stalking to include conduct that causes a person to experience a reasonable fear of death or serious bodily injury to his or her pet.

Additionally, an interstate violation of a protection order includes interstate travel with the intent to violate a protection order against a pet that is included within the scope of the protection order. The bill specifies the applicable criminal penalty—a prison term of up to five years, a fine, or both—for a person who commits an interstate violation of a protection order against a pet.

With respect to a defendant who commits a domestic violence offense or an interstate violation of a protection order, mandatory restitution in the "full amount of victim's losses" includes costs incurred for veterinary services related to the pet.

The bill directs the Department of Agriculture to award grants for shelter and housing assistance and support services for domestic violence victims with pets.

Finally, it expresses the sense of Congress that states should include, in domestic violence protection orders, protections against violence or threats against a person's pet.